KS SCR1603 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - Senate Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Tuesday, January 29, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Joint rules for the Senate and House of Representatives, 2019-2020 biennium.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint rules for the Senate and House of Representatives, 2019-2020 biennium.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-25 - House - House Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 109 Nay: 6 (Y: 109 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 1 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-29SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Tuesday, January 29, 2019
2019-01-25HouseHouse Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 109 Nay: 6
2019-01-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be adopted
2019-01-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Highberger was rejected
2019-01-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Highberger
2019-01-23HouseHouse Committee Report recommending resolution be adopted by Committee on Rules and Journal
2019-01-16HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Rules and Journal
2019-01-16HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-01-15SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 1
2019-01-15SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be adopted
2019-01-14SenateSenate Referred to General Orders from the Chair
2019-01-14SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback