KS SCR1612 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Senate Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Tuesday, April 9, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adjournment of 2019 Legislature until May 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adjournment of 2019 Legislature until May 1, 2019.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Secretary of State on Tuesday, April 9, 2019
2019-04-05HouseHouse Adopted without roll call
2019-04-05HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-04-05SenateSenate Adopted without roll call
2019-04-05SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback