KS SR1708 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-03 - Senate Enrolled on Friday, February 03, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-03 - Senate Enrolled on Friday, February 03, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing February 3, 2017, as National Wear Red Day.
Title
Recognizing February 3, 2017, as National Wear Red Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | Senate | Senate Enrolled on Friday, February 03, 2017 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Adopted without roll call |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sr1708/ |
Text | http://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sr1708_enrolled.pdf |