KS SR1762 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-5)
Status: Passed on February 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-07 - Senate Enrolled on Wednesday, February 07, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizing that pornography is a public health hazard leading to a broad spectrum of individual and public health impacts and societal harms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing that pornography is a public health hazard leading to a broad spectrum of individual and public health impacts and societal harms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Adopted - Yea: 35 Nay: 4 (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-07SenateSenate Enrolled on Wednesday, February 07, 2018
2018-02-06SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Adopted; Yea: 35 Nay: 4
2018-02-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be adopted
2018-01-31SenateSenate Referred to Committee of the Whole
2018-01-30SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback