KY HB1 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 48-11)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - to Education (H)
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 158.441 to include definitions of school safety and school security; amend KRS 158.442 to include development and implementation of a school safety coordinator training program; specify membership on the Center for School Safety board of directors; amend KRS 158.443 to specify the board of directors is to appoint an executive director, establish all positions of the center, approve a school security risk assessment tool, review the organizational structure of the center and make recommendations; create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to establish the state school security marshal to be appointed by and report to the Department of Criminal Justice Training; require the marshal to report annually to the Center for School Safety; require development of a school security risk assessment tool; require reporting by school superintendents on completion of the risk assessment annually; require mandatory additional staff training if the risk assessment is not completed; create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to require school district superintendents to appoint a school safety coordinator; require the school safety coordinator to complete training within six months of appointment; require the coordinator to designate threat assessment teams at each school in the district; require the coordinator to prescribe policies and procedures for an all-hazards approach to school safety; require the coordinator to ensure that all school campuses in their district are toured at least once per school year; create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to promote the assignment of a school resource officer to each school; require the Kentucky Law Enforcement Council to promulgate administrative regulations to establish school resource officer training and course curriculum; require superintendents to report annually to the Center for School Safety the number and placement of school resource officers in the district; amend KRS 15.330 to conform; amend KRS 158.162 to require all districts to restrict the access to each school building by July 1, 2022; withhold approval of new building construction or expansion approval without compliance; amend KRS 156.095 to require suicide prevention awareness information be provided to students in person, by live streaming, or via video recording; require suicide training provided to staff to include the recognition of signs and symptoms of mental illness; require staff with job duties requiring direct contact with students to receive a minimum of one hour of training annually on responding to an active shooter; create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to define mental health professional and trauma-informed approach; direct all schools to adopt a trauma-informed approach to education; require by July 1, 2021, as funds become available, each school district to provide a mental health professional for each one thousand five hundred students; require by January 1, 2020, the Department of Education make available a tool kit to assist school districts in developing a trauma-informed approach; require by July 1, 2020, each local board of education to develop a plan for implementing a trauma-informed approach; amend KRS 70.062 to encourage sheriffs to collaborate with local school districts on policies and procedures for communicating instances of student-involved trauma; amend KRS 95.970 to encourage chiefs of police to collaborate with local school districts on policies and procedures for communicating instances of student-involved trauma; create a new section of KRS Chapter 16 to encourage the Department of Kentucky State Police to work with school districts pertaining to school and student safety and emergency response plans and concerns and policies and procedures for communicating instances of student involved trauma; amend KRS 508.078 to include in terroristic threatening in the second degree making false statements by any means for the purpose of causing evacuation, cancellation, or creating fear of bodily harm in schools or among students, parents, or school personnel; create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to require the Department of Education make available to each school district an anonymous reporting tool; allow the reporting individual to stay anonymous; require information reported be immediately sent to administration of each school district and law enforcement agencies affected; require the Department of Education develop and provide a comprehensive training and awareness program on the anonymous reporting tool; create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to require principals to provide each school year written notice to all students, parents, and guardians of the provisions of KRS 508.078 and potential penalties under KRS 532.060 and 534.030; create a new section of Chapter 158 to allow the board of directors of any public school district foundation to accept gifts or donations restricted for school security purposes and use them exclusively for the purpose granted; encourage the organization of foundations to support public school districts for which no foundation exists; Act shall be known as the School Safety and Resiliency Act; direct the Office of Education Accountability to conduct a study on the use of guidance counselors' time in schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to school safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-11Houseto Education (H)
2019-01-10Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback