KY HB106 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 100)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 100)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 311A.010 to define "advanced emergency medical technician," "advanced practice paramedic," "community paramedic," "emergency medical responder," "emergency medical services educator," "executive director," "mobile integrated healthcare," and "mobile integrated healthcare program medical director;" update other definitions; amend KRS 311A.015 to change "first responder" to "emergency medical responder"; to specify that one member of the board may be an emergency medical technician or advanced emergency medical technician; specify board member term limits; amend KRS 311A.020 to change "first responder" to "emergency medical responder"; add certification of advanced emergency medical technicians, mobile integrated healthcare programs, and advanced practice paramedics; permit advanced emergency medical technicians to be assigned to investigate emergency medical responders or emergency medical technicians; require that advanced emergency medical technician programs be investigated and regulated by advanced emergency medical technicians or paramedics; amend KRS 311A.025 to change "first responder" to "emergency medical responder" and add certification and licensure for emergency medical services educator, advanced emergency medical technician, advanced practice paramedic, and mobile integrated healthcare program medical director; amend KRS 311A.030 to update licensing categories; amend KRS 311A.040 to establish Franklin Circuit Court as the court with jurisdiction for hearing appeals on advisory opinions of the board; amend KRS 311A.050 to change "first responder" to "emergency medical responder"; change "first responder instructor or instructor trainer, emergency medical technician instructor or instructor trainer, or paramedic instructor, paramedic instructor trainer" to "emergency medical services educator"; add advanced emergency medical technicians, advanced practice paramedics, emergency medical services medical director, and mobile integrated healthcare program medical director; require the use of an official complaint form approved by the board through administrative regulations; amend KRS 311A.055 to change "first responder, emergency medical technician, paramedic, emergency medical services director" to "emergency medical services personnel"; and specify the executive director's responsibility to notify in the case of an official complaint; amend KRS 311A.060 to change "paramedic, first responder, or emergency medical technician" to "emergency medical services personnel"; change "first responder" to "emergency medical responder;" add advanced emergency medical technicians; remove language requiring the revocation of license or certification for completion of a diversion program for a felony offense; amend KRS 311A.065 to update psychological or physical evaluation requirements; amend KRS 311A.075 to permit the chair of the board or a designee of the chair to determine that immediate and temporary suspension of licensure or certification is necessary to protect the public; amend KRS 311A.095 to change "first responder" to "emergency medical responder"; add advanced emergency medical technicians; add electronic mail application requirements; delete outdated transition language; amend KRS 311A.105 to add electronic mailing requirements; amend KRS 311A.120 to change "first responder" to "emergency medical responder"; add advanced emergency medical technicians and paramedics; amend KRS 311A.125 to delete continuing competency documentation requirement; amend KRS 311A.130 to change "first responder, emergency medical technician, or paramedic" to "emergency medical services personnel"; amend KRS 311A.140 to delete outdated transition language and specify certification and licensure requirements; amend KRS 311A.170 to require the promulgation of administrative regulations establishing the educational, testing, credentialing, and licensure requirements for advanced practice paramedics and paramedic subspecialties; permit a paramedic to render services under the supervision of a mobile integrated healthcare program medical director or emergency department medical director; permit a certified community paramedic to provide mobile integrated healthcare services only as an employee of a mobile integrated healthcare program; amend KRS 311A.175 to change "first responder" to "emergency medical responder"; add "advanced emergency medical technician"; amend KRS 311A.190 to change "run form" to "patient care record"; add mobile integrated healthcare program; create a new section of KRS Chapter 311A to set requirements for advanced emergency medical technicians; amend KRS 95A.262, 189.910, and 311.550 to conform; repeal KRS 311A.110, 311A.115, and 311A.127.
Title
AN ACT relating to emergency medical services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 350 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, sfa 2 RSN# 987 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 78 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, sfa 2 RSN# 987 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 78 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 100) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | passed 91-0 |
2019-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (2) |
2019-03-14 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (2) |
2019-03-14 | House | to Rules (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (2) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2019-03-12 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2019-03-07 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2019-03-07 | Senate | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2019-03-07 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill |
2019-03-05 | Senate | returned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | taken from Health & Welfare (S) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-20 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-15 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 19, 2019 |
2019-02-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-05 | House | posted in committee |
2019-01-10 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2019-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Emergency Medical Services
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Local Government
Occupations and Professions
Physicians and Practitioners
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Local Government
Occupations and Professions
Physicians and Practitioners