KY HB120 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 23)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 23)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 531 to prohibit the distribution of any material that portrays child pornography or a sexual performance by a minor.
Title
AN ACT relating to child pornography.
Sponsors
Rep. Chad McCoy [R] | Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. Jim Duplessis [R] | Rep. Wesley Morgan [R] |
Rep. David Osborne [R] | Rep. Brandon Reed [R] | Rep. Jody Richards [D] | Rep. John Sims [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 254 (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 503 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 39 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 503 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 39 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 23) |
2018-03-12 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-12 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-09 | House | passed 83-0 |
2018-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2018-03-08 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2018-03-07 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-03-07 | House | received in House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 6, 2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-01 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-01-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 89-0 |
2018-01-18 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, January 19, 2018 |
2018-01-18 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-17 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-01-08 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-05 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | introduced in House |