KY HB120 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 441.520 to require a judicial removal order cite danger for order of removal, establish incarceration rates and medical costs, impose geographic limits for removal, place liability for transfers upon the Administrative Office of the Courts, require that in all other removal orders the judge shall receive the written agreement of the originating and receiving jailer, establish the details of written agreement, establish criteria for cost and transportation, and require judge to review removal orders every 90 days for safety and security of inmates.
Title
AN ACT relating to the transfer of county jail inmates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | posting withdrawn |
2020-01-24 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-07 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-11-21 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |