KY HB125 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 150 to prohibit the destruction or abandonment of usable meat from deer or elk that are taken and killed in the Commonwealth; prohibit the dumping of deer or elk carcasses on public areas or private areas without permission; provide exceptions; amend KRS 150.990 to establish penalties for violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to wild game carcasses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-02-15Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 19, 2019
2019-02-15House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-14Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-11Houseposted in committee
2019-01-10Houseto Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H)
2019-01-08Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback