KY HB129 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 21)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 21)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS 211.180 to 211.190 to establish definitions; establish the amount of funds to be allocated to and used by local health departments in Kentucky for employment, services, and programs; amend KRS 194A.050, 211.180, 211.357, 211.976, 217.125, and 217.811 to establish new requirements of allowable fees; APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to public health, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 213 (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 RSN# 1283 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 107 (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 RSN# 1283 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 107 (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 21) |
2020-03-11 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-10 | House | passed 81-3 |
2020-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate floor amendment (1) |
2020-03-09 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendment (1) on Tuesday, March 10, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | to Rules (H) |
2020-03-06 | House | received in House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-2 with floor amendment (1) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-03 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-02-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-26 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-18 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-13 | House | 3rd reading, passed 88-1 with Committee Substitute (2) |
2020-02-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 12, 2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2) |
2020-01-24 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-21 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-01-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-13 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-07 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Appropriations
Effective Dates, Emergency
Health and Medical Services
Inspections
Local Mandate
Public Health
State Agencies
State Employees
Effective Dates, Emergency
Health and Medical Services
Inspections
Local Mandate
Public Health
State Agencies
State Employees