KY HB132 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 136)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 136)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 439.3401 to provide that any person convicted of manslaughter in the second degree, reckless homicide, or criminal attempt to commit murder of clearly identifiable emergency medical services personnel shall serve at least 85 percent of the sentence before probation or parole.
Title
AN ACT relating to violent offenders.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Meredith [R] | Rep. Rob Rothenburger [R] | Rep. Terri Branham Clark [D] | Rep. Joni Jenkins [D] |
Rep. Ed Massey [R] | Rep. Jason Petrie [R] | Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] | Rep. Sal Santoro [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1022 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 50 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 50 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 136) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-12 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-12 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2019-03-06 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2019-02-14 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-08 | House | posted in committee |
2019-01-10 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | introduced in House |