KY HB133 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 007)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 007)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 198B.658 to allow a licensed mechanical engineer with two years of experience within or outside the Commonwealth to satisfy the experience requirement for a master HVAC contractor applicant; amend KRS 198B.660 to eliminate certain requirements for HVAC license examinations; amend KRS 198B.6673 and 198B.6678 to require an HVAC inspector to become certified within 12 months of his or her employment.
Title
AN ACT relating to mechanical systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 881 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 25 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 25 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 007) |
2019-03-01 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-01 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-02-28 | House | received in House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-26 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-15 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2019-02-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 12, 2019 |
2019-02-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-01-11 | House | posted in committee |
2019-01-10 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | introduced in House |