KY HB135 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 39)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 39)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 311.842 to require the Kentucky Board of Medical Licensure to promulgate administrative regulations relating the prescribing of controlled substances by physician assistants; amend KRS 311.844 to establish continuing education requirements for physician assistants who are authorized to prescribe controlled substances; amend KRS 311.850 to permit the board to take action against the license of a physician's assistant for certain sexual offenses, for being unable to practice medicine due to physical or mental illness, or for engaging in dishonorable, unethical, or unprofessional conduct; amend KRS 311.854 to permit the executive director of the board to temporarily approve an application for licensure and to require the board to review and approve or deny the application; 311.856 to conform; amend 311.858 to establish the process by which a physician assistant can apply for authorization to prescribe and administer controlled substances and to establish limitations on prescriptions for controlled substances issued by a physician assistant; create a new section of KRS 311.840 to 311.862 to permit a hearing or inquiry panel to order a physician assistant to undergo a physical or mental examination; create a new section of KRS 311.840 to 311.862 to permit a hearing or inquiry panel to order a physician assistant to complete a clinical competency examination or clinical skills assessment; amend KRS 311.616 to expand the impaired physicians program to include physician assistants; amend KRS 311.617 to expand the Kentucky Physicians Health Foundation to include physician assistants; amend KRS 311.619 to provide confidentiality to physician assistants participating in the impaired physician and physician assistants program; and amend KRS 218A.010 to amend the definition of practitioner.
Title
AN ACT relating to licensees of the Kentucky Board of Medical Licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 272 (Y: 80 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1333 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 76 (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1333 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 76 (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | House | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 39) |
2020-03-19 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-19 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-19 | House | passed 80-1 |
2020-03-19 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-19 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-18 | House | to Rules (H) |
2020-03-18 | House | received in House |
2020-03-17 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-11 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-10 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-05 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-03 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-06 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-02-06 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2020-02-06 | House | taken from Rules |
2020-01-31 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-30 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-01-28 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-22 | House | reassigned to Health and Family Services (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-12-05 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Drugs and Medicines
Health and Medical Services
Local Mandate
Occupations and Professions
Physicians and Practitioners
Drugs and Medicines
Health and Medical Services
Local Mandate
Occupations and Professions
Physicians and Practitioners