KY HB140 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 154)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 154)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 151B.131, 151B.132, 151B.133, 151B.134, 164.020, 164.036, and 12.020 to change the name of the Office for Education and Workforce to the Office of the Kentucky Center for Statistics, and to change the name of the Board of the Kentucky Center for Education and Workforce Statistics to the Board of the Kentucky Center for Statistics; amend KRS 151B.134 to remove the executive director of the Education Professional Standards Board from the board and replace the executive director with the secretary of the Cabinet for Health and Family Services.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Center for Education and Workforce Statistics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1023 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 158 (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 158 (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 154) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-12 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-12 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2019-03-06 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 59-40 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1) |
2019-02-19 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-02-15 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 19, 2019 |
2019-02-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-05 | House | posted in committee |
2019-01-10 | House | to State Government (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Boards and Commissions
Education, Higher
Education, Vocational
Public Records and Reports
State Agencies
Education, Higher
Education, Vocational
Public Records and Reports
State Agencies