KY HB143 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 18A.355 to provide for an annual cost of living adjustment for state employees with the cost of living adjustment being the average of the consumer price index for the two calendar years prior to the biennium and not less than zero; and amend KRS 18A.110 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to state employee compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-02-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-13 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-07 | House | to State Government (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-12-09 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |