KY HB149 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - floor amendments (6), (7), (8) and (9) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - floor amendments (6), (7), (8) and (9) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections in KRS Chapter 141 to establish the Education Opportunity Account Program; define terms and eligibility for the program; establish the requirements of the account-granting organizations and the Department of Revenue; allow auditing of account-granting organizations by the Department of Revenue; create a tax credit for taxes imposed by KRS 141.020, 141.040, and 141.0401; require reporting to the Interim Joint Committee on Appropriations and Revenue; create short title; amend KRS 141.0205 to order the tax credit; amend KRS 131.190 to allow reporting by the Department of Revenue.
Title
AN ACT relating to opportunities in education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | House | floor amendments (6), (7), (8) and (9) filed |
2021-02-09 | House | floor amendment (5) filed |
2021-02-04 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-04 | House | floor amendments (1), (2), (3) and (4) filed |
2021-02-02 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Charitable Organizations and Institutions
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Education, Finance
Fiscal Note
Reports Mandated
Short Titles and Popular Names
State Agencies
Taxation
Taxation, Income--Corporate
Taxation, Income--Individual
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Education, Finance
Fiscal Note
Reports Mandated
Short Titles and Popular Names
State Agencies
Taxation
Taxation, Income--Corporate
Taxation, Income--Individual