KY HB15 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 512.070 to include, as criminal littering, permitting unsafe amounts of mowed grass to remain on a highway.
Title
AN ACT relating to road safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Regina Huff [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | House | posting withdrawn |
2020-01-10 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-07 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-06-12 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |