KY HB151 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 143)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 304.47-020 to establish a range of criminal penalties resulting from conviction of insurance fraud; amend KRS 304.47-050 to require certain Kentucky health professional boards to report suspected insurance fraud to the Department of Insurance's Division of Insurance Fraud Investigation and to require the boards to provide information requested by the insurance commissioner; amend KRS 189.635 to require the Department of Kentucky State Police to redact vehicle accident reports provided to news-gathering organizations; provide an exception to redaction for up to three reports per day; make technical revisions; create a new section of Subtitle 39 of KRS Chapter 304 to prohibit physician self-referrals of health care services for which payment may be made from basic reparations benefits provided under the Motor Vehicle Reparations Act; incorporate exceptions provided in federal law; require refund of amounts collected in violation of section; amend KRS 304.99-060 to establish civil penalties for violation of Section 4 of the Act; amend KRS 311.597 to deem violation of Section 4 or 5 of the Act by a physician "dishonorable, unethical, or unprofessional conduct."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to insurance fraud.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 331 (Y: 71 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SFA 1 RSN# 961 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 68 (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 143)
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Housepassed 71-29
2019-03-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1)
2019-03-13Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1)
2019-03-13Houseto Rules (H)
2019-03-13Housereceived in House
2019-03-13Senate3rd reading, passed 36-1 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1)
2019-03-13Senatetaken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
2019-03-12Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2019-03-12Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2019-03-07Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2019-03-07Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019
2019-03-06Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-05Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-25Senateto Banking & Insurance (S)
2019-02-21Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-20House3rd reading, passed 93-5 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-14Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2019
2019-02-14House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-13Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-07Houseposted in committee
2019-01-11Houseto Banking & Insurance (H)
2019-01-10Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/hb151.html
Texthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/hb151/orig_bill.pdf
Texthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/hb151/bill.pdf
Amendmenthttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/HB151/HCS1.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/hb151/HCS1CI.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/hb151/HCS1LM.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/hb151/LM.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/hb151/CI.pdf
Roll Callhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/hb151/vote_history.pdf
Supplementhttps://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/note/19RS/hb151/SCS1CI.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback