KY HB156 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 63)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 63)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establish KRS Chapter 395A and create new sections thereof to enact the Revised Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act to establish a framework for the management and disposition of digital assets upon death or incapacitation; define terms; set forth the applicability of the chapter to fiduciaries, personal representatives, conservators, and trustees, and provide that the chapter does not apply to a digital asset of an employer that is used by an employee in the ordinary course of business; prioritize user directions regarding disclosure over certain terms-of-service agreements; provide that the Act does not impair custodian and user access to records under terms-of-service agreements; establish procedures for disclosing digital assets; enumerate documentation required for a personal representative to gain access to content of electronic communications; enumerate documentation required to access digital assets other than the content of a decedent's electronic communications; enumerate documentation required for a person with power of attorney to gain access to the content of electronic communications of principal; enumerate documentation required to access digital assets other than the content of a principal's electronic communications; authorize disclosure to trustees who are original users of a trust's digital assets; enumerate documentation required for content disclosure to a trustee; enumerate documentation required for disclosure of a trust's digital assets other than content; enumerate documentation required for a conservator to gain access to a protected person's digital assets; apply fiduciary duties and authority to digital assets; provide compliance guidelines for the custodians of digital records; require that the chapter be applied to promote uniformity among the states; establish conformity with federal requirements related to electronic signatures and records; provide that the chapter may be cited as the Revised Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act (2015).
Title
AN ACT relating to Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1375 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 65 (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 65 (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | House | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 63) |
2020-03-19 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-19 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-19 | House | received in House |
2020-03-18 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 31-0 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 18, 2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2020-02-07 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-04 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-1 |
2020-02-03 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 4, 2020 |
2020-01-30 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-29 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-10 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-07 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-12-11 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Civil Procedure
Courts
Fiduciaries
Guardians
Retroactive Legislation
Taxation, Inheritance and Estate
Uniform Laws
Wills and Estates
Civil Procedure
Courts
Fiduciaries
Guardians
Retroactive Legislation
Taxation, Inheritance and Estate
Uniform Laws
Wills and Estates