KY HB167 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 14)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 14)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 625.060 and 625.070 to specify the rights of a foster parent related to involuntary termination of parental rights cases.
Title
AN ACT relating to involuntary termination of parental rights and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1276 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 22 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 22 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 14) |
2020-03-06 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-06 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-05 | House | received in House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-0 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 4, 2020 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-27 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-01-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 92-0 with Committee Substitute (1), floor amendment (2), and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-01-21 | House | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-01-16 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 17, 2020 |
2020-01-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-15 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-01-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-01-10 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-07 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-12-12 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |