KY HB174 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - returned to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - returned to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 61.878 to exclude from the Open Records Act gruesome photographs or videos of persons prepared, owned, used, possessed, or retained by public agencies.
Title
AN ACT relating to public records and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 153 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2020-03-18 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | 1st reading |
2020-03-17 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1) |
2020-02-26 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-02-24 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-13 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-07 | House | to State Government (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-12-13 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |