KY HB181 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 138)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 165A.310 to expand the definition of "proprietary schools" to include not-for-profit proprietary schools; amend KRS 165A.320 to include not-for-profit proprietary schools; amend KRS 165A.340 to eliminate the requirement that members of the Kentucky Commission on Proprietary Education be from for-profit proprietary schools; amend KRS 165A.350 to include other collateral in the requirements for an agent's bond; amend KRS 165A.360 to conform and to allow other collateral in the requirement for the school's surety bond.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to proprietary education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1037 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 236 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 138)
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Housereceived in House
2019-03-14Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0
2019-03-14Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019
2019-03-13Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-12Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-03-07Senateto Education (S)
2019-03-07Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-06House3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-05Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 6, 2019
2019-03-05Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-04Housereturned to Education (H)
2019-03-04House1st reading
2019-03-04Housetaken from Education (H)
2019-02-21Houseposted in committee
2019-02-06Houseto Education (H)
2019-02-05Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback