KY HB187 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 132 to exempt property used in the deployment of advanced broadband technologies from state and local ad valorem tax for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2019, but prior to January 1, 2023; add a purpose statement; require reporting by the taxpayer and the Department of Revenue; amend KRS 132.010 to define property used in the deployment of advanced broadband technologies; amend KRS 131.190 to allow reporting by the Department of Revenue to the Legislative Research Commission; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to exempting property used in the deployment of advanced broadband technologies from state and local ad valorem taxation and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-06Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-02-05Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback