KY HB189 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 510 to make the sexual endangerment of a child a Class D felony; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to the sexual endangerment of a child and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | posting withdrawn |
2020-01-10 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-09 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Children and Minors
Corrections Impact
Crime Victims
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Effective Dates, Emergency
Local Mandate
Corrections Impact
Crime Victims
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Effective Dates, Emergency
Local Mandate