KY HB191 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 095)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 095)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 15.391, relating to grounds for the revocation of peace officer certification, to distinguish conditions that require revocation from those that may trigger revocation; provide that hearings shall be conducted in accordance with KRS Chapter 13B; require an agency that has knowledge of a peace officer in its employment who meets any revocation condition to report that condition to the Kentucky Law Enforcement Council and provide that Kentucky Law Enforcement Foundation Program funds may be suspended if the agency fails to report; clarify that this section shall not apply to peace officers employed by the Department of Kentucky State Police unless and until the peace office is no longer employed by the department; allow the council to promulgate administrative regulations to implement this section; amend KRS 15.386 and 15.440 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to the revocation of peace officer certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 962 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 144 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 144 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 095) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-13 | House | received in House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill |
2019-03-06 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1) |
2019-02-14 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-02-14 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-11 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-11 | House | reassigned to Local Government (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-06 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | introduced in House |