KY HB195 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts ch. 87)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts ch. 87)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 424.110 to 424.370 to give local governments the option to post required advertisements online on a notice Web site operated by local government in lieu of newspaper publication, so long as a one-time advertisement is published in an actual newspaper; specify requirements for advertisements published on the notice Web site and in an actual newspaper; specify rights of public and duties of local government; set out consequences of local government's failure to publish as required by law; provide penalty.
Title
AN ACT relating to the publication of local government legal advertisements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1444 (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 347 (Y: 55 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1331 (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 127 (Y: 51 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Adopt HFA 2 RCS# 126 (Y: 17 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 125 (Y: 60 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 347 (Y: 55 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1331 (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 127 (Y: 51 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Adopt HFA 2 RCS# 126 (Y: 17 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Suspend the Rules RCS# 125 (Y: 60 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts ch. 87) |
2020-04-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-04-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-04-14 | Senate | received in House |
2020-04-14 | House | passed 23-9 |
2020-04-14 | House | veto overridden in Senate |
2020-04-14 | House | posted for consideration of Governor's veto |
2020-04-14 | House | to Rules (S) |
2020-04-14 | House | received in Senate |
2020-04-14 | Senate | bill passed 55-32 |
2020-04-14 | Senate | veto overridden in House |
2020-04-14 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2020-04-14 | Senate | taken from Rules |
2020-04-01 | Senate | to Rules (H) |
2020-04-01 | Senate | veto message received in House |
2020-03-27 | House | Vetoed |
2020-03-18 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-18 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-18 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-18 | House | received in House |
2020-03-17 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 20-12 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-11 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-19 | House | passed 51-40 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1) |
2020-02-19 | House | floor amendment (2) defeated |
2020-02-19 | House | 3rd reading |
2020-02-19 | House | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-02-18 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-02-13 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 14, 2020 |
2020-02-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-15 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-09 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Advertising
Cities
Communications
Consolidated Local Governments
Counties, Urban
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Local Government
Local Mandate
News Media
Notices
Unified Local Governments
Cities
Communications
Consolidated Local Governments
Counties, Urban
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Local Government
Local Mandate
News Media
Notices
Unified Local Governments