KY HB196 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 015)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 39E.030 to change the quorum requirement for the Emergency Response Commission to a simple majority of currently appointed members.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the Emergency Response Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 912 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 55 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 015)
2019-03-05Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-05Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-05Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-04Housereceived in House
2019-03-04Senate3rd reading, passed 34-0
2019-03-04Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 4, 2019
2019-03-01Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-28Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-19Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-02-15Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-15House3rd reading, passed 96-0
2019-02-14Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2019
2019-02-14House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-13Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-07Houseposted in committee
2019-02-06Houseto Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H)
2019-02-05Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback