KY HB197 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 29A.170 to increase payment for jurors from five dollars to thirty dollars per day.
Title
AN ACT relating to pay for jury service and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Bobby McCool [R] | Rep. Deanna Frazier Gordon [R] | Rep. David Hale [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
Rep. Maria Sorolis [D] | Rep. Susan Westrom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | posting withdrawn |
2020-01-24 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-09 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hb197.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hb197/orig_bill.pdf |