KY HB200 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 241.010 to revise the definition of "souvenir package"; amend KRS 243.0305 to remove requirement for souvenir packages to be available to any Kentucky retail licensee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to alcoholic beverages.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-02-28Housetaken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
2019-02-27Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 28, 2019
2019-02-27Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a Consent Bill
2019-02-25Housereturned to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
2019-02-25House1st reading
2019-02-25Housetaken from Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
2019-02-08Houseposted in committee
2019-02-06Houseto Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
2019-02-05Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback