KY HB21 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 076)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 076)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 156.496 to allow school districts to accept monetary donations for the operation and maintenance of family resource and youth services centers; require that donations be used exclusively for those purposes.
Title
AN ACT relating to family resource and youth services centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1021 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 171 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 171 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 076) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-12 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2019-03-12 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2019-03-06 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2019-03-01 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-28 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 |
2019-02-28 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2019-02-27 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-26 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2019-01-10 | House | to Education (H) |
2019-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
2018-09-13 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Children and Minors
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Education, Finance
Taxation
Taxation, Income--Corporate
Taxation, Income--Individual
Education, Elementary and Secondary
Education, Finance
Taxation
Taxation, Income--Corporate
Taxation, Income--Individual