KY HB214 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 70 detailing the powers and duties of constables, excluding the general powers of peace or police officers, with certain exceptions; allow police powers where the county grants them and the constable or deputy has been certified pursuant to KRS 15.380 to 15.404, so long as that certification is maintained; amend KRS 15.707 deleting constables; amend KRS 16.060 deleting constables; amend KRS 61.300 deleting deputy constables; amend KRS 61.310 deleting deputy constables; amend KRS 63.170 by adding constables; amend KRS 63.180 by adding deputy constables; amend KRS 64.060 to remove noncertified constables from the fee schedule for services and allow certified constables to continue to receive fees per the schedule; amend KRS 64.190 to amend constable fee schedule; amend KRS 64.200 to exclude urban-county governments from constable compensation requirements and include deputy constables within reporting requirements; amend KRS 70.310 to require deputy constables to execute bond; amend KRS 70.320 to allow the appointment of deputy constables; specify how they are appointed and their numbers determined, and their qualifications; amend KRS 70.350 to clarify where constables may execute warrants; amend KRS 70.410 to include deputy constables; amend KRS 70.430 to clarify the nature and recipient of constable and deputy constable's reports; grant fiscal courts or county clerks and merged governments the authority to retain 25% of fees collected; amend KRS 70.440 to include mandated reports within false reporting prohibitions; amend KRS 148.056 to remove constables; amend KRS 150.100 to remove constables; amend KRS 164.955 to specify that powers of constables are not being diluted or removed; amend KRS 183.881 to clarify that constable powers are not impaired or diminished; amend KRS 189.950 to permit vehicle blue lights for constables if the county grants them the authority and if they are certified as peace officers; amend KRS 230.240 to remove constables; amend KRS 277.280 to remove constables; amend KRS 281.765 to remove constables and deputies; amend KRS 446.010 to remove constables from definition of "peace officers"; amend KRS 454.140 to direct service of process first to sheriffs; exclude urban-county and consolidated local governments from this requirement, unless they pass ordinances granting the sheriff priority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to local government.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-02-27Housefloor amendments (2), (3) and (4) filed
2019-02-26Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2019-02-14Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2019
2019-02-14House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-13Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-08Houseposted in committee
2019-02-06Houseto Local Government (H)
2019-02-05Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback