KY HB217 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 158)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 311.878 to update certifying bodies; create a new section of KRS 311.864 to 311.890 to provide for temporary certification and the cancellation of temporary certification; repeal KRS 311.882.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the licensure of surgical assistants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 963 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 188 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 158)
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-13Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-13Housereceived in House
2019-03-13Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0
2019-03-13Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 13, 2019
2019-03-12Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
2019-03-06Senateto Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
2019-03-06Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2019-03-06Senate1st reading
2019-03-06Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2019-03-04Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-01House3rd reading, passed 96-0 with floor amendment (1)
2019-02-25Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2019-02-22Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019
2019-02-21House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-20Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-15Houseposted in committee
2019-02-06Houseto Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
2019-02-05Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback