KY HB224 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - became law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 176)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - became law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 176)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 205 to establish definition of "durable medical equipment," to ensure that suppliers of durable medical equipment, prosthetics, orthotics, and supplies receive proper reimbursement of claims filed with prior authorization of service despite a Medicaid recipient moving to a different Medicaid managed care organization during the authorization period; require suppliers to be reimbursed at no less than 100% of the Kentucky Medicaid program durable medical equipment fee schedule; require items with miscellaneous HCPCS codes to be reimbursed at the manufacturer's suggested retail price minus 15% and those items without a manufacturer's suggested retail price reimbursed at invoice plus 20%; require Medicaid managed care organizations to cover the same quantities of medical supplies as are established on the Kentucky Medicaid program durable medical equipment fee schedule; require the allowable timeframe for claim submissions to be equal to the timeframe for any discrepancy during the Medicaid managed care organization's audit or recoupment period.
Title
AN ACT relating to durable medical equipment covered benefits and reimbursement under Medicaid.
Sponsors
Rep. Kimberly Moser [R] | Rep. Steve Sheldon [R] | Rep. Danny Bentley [R] | Rep. Adam Bowling [R] |
Rep. Joe Graviss [D] | Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] | Rep. Walker Thomas [R] | Rep. Lisa Willner [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 365 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa 1 RSN# 991 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 87 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa 1 RSN# 991 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 87 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | became law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 176) |
2019-03-26 | House | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | passed 89-0 |
2019-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate floor amendment (1) |
2019-03-14 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendment (1) |
2019-03-14 | House | to Rules (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-05 | Senate | returned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | taken from Health & Welfare (S) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 |
2019-02-15 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 19, 2019 |
2019-02-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-12 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-06 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | introduced in House |