KY HB226 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - posted in committee
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - posted in committee
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 248 to require the governor's Office of Agricultural Policy to create and administer a program related to farmer-focused mental health service; amend KRS 304.17B-003 to appropriate $500,000 for the farmer-focused mental health service program beginning on July 1, 2020; make conforming changes; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to farmer-focused mental health services and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-06 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Agriculture
Appropriations
Budget and Financial Administration
Health and Medical Services
Mental Health
Appropriations
Budget and Financial Administration
Health and Medical Services
Mental Health
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/hb226.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/hb226/orig_bill.pdf |