KY HB227 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - became law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 025)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - became law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 025)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 160.280 to increase the allowed per diem for members of local boards of education from $75 to $150; increase the total annual maximum of per diem and reimbursed expenses from $3,000 to $6,000; EFFECTIVE July 1, 2019.
Title
AN ACT relating to members of boards of education.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Reed [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] | Rep. David Hale [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 254 (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa 1 RSN# 921 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 59 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa 1 RSN# 921 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 59 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | became law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 025) |
2019-03-19 | House | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2019-03-07 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-07 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-07 | House | passed 90-1 |
2019-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate floor amendment (1) |
2019-03-07 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendment (1) |
2019-03-07 | House | taken from Rules |
2019-03-06 | House | to Rules (H) |
2019-03-06 | House | received in House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2019-03-04 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 4, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-28 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-02-19 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2019-02-14 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-08 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-06 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | introduced in House |