KY HB238 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - to Natural Resources & Energy (S)
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 511.100 to change the definition of key infrastructure assets and include felony penalties for trespass upon key infrastructure assets in the first degree.
Title
AN ACT relating to trespass upon key infrastructure assets.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Gooch [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 142 (Y: 81 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-01 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 81-16 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-11 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-06 | House | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2019-02-05 | House | introduced in House |