KY HB241 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-27 - to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 12.355, relating to occupational licensure for members of the United States Armed Forces, to remove the active duty requirement.
Title
AN ACT relating to occupational licensure for military service members.
Sponsors
Rep. Les Yates [R] | Rep. David Hale [R] | Rep. Matthew Koch [R] | Rep. Tim Moore [R] |
Rep. Steve Sheldon [R] | Rep. Wilson Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 110 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2019-02-21 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-15 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-07 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2019-02-06 | House | introduced in House |