KY HB256 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 148 to establish the Harrodsburg Sestercentennial Commission to coordinate celebrations; establish membership of the commission; establish sunset date of January 1, 2027.
Title
AN ACT relating to the establishment of historical commissions.
Sponsors
Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Adam Bowling [R] | Rep. Daniel Fister [R] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] |
Rep. Ashley Tackett Laferty [D] | Rep. Billy Wesley [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 87 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-29 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 92-0 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-02-09 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 10, 2021 |
2021-02-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-04 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2021-02-02 | House | posted in committee |
2021-01-13 | House | to Tourism & Outdoor Recreation (H) |
2021-01-12 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-12 | House | introduced in House |