KY HB26 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 079)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 079)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 45A.385 to increase from $20,000 to $30,000 the maximum amount of a contract for which a local public agency may use small purchase procedures; amend KRS 424.260 to allow local officials to make contracts up to $30,000, rather than up to $20,000, without taking out newspaper advertisements for bids.
Title
AN ACT relating to procurement.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Rothenburger [R] | Rep. Larry Elkins [R] | Rep. Brandon Reed [R] | Rep. John Sims [D] |
Rep. Walker Thomas [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 351 (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, scta 1 RSN# 1008 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 46 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, scta 1 RSN# 1008 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 46 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 079) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | passed 89-2 |
2019-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-03-14 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-03-14 | House | to Rules (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | received in House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2019-02-14 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-05 | House | posted in committee |
2019-01-10 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2019-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
2018-09-07 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Cities
Contracts
Counties
County Clerks
Courts, Fiscal
Local Government
Local Mandate
Notices
Publications
Sheriffs
Special Districts
Special Purpose Governmental Entities
Contracts
Counties
County Clerks
Courts, Fiscal
Local Government
Local Mandate
Notices
Publications
Sheriffs
Special Districts
Special Purpose Governmental Entities