KY HB263 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 77)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 77)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 217.015 to redefine "retail food store," "home-based processor," "home-based microprocessor," and "farmer"; amend KRS 217.136 to change acceptable food products that may be offered by a home-based processor for sale in this state; amend KRS 217.137 to change acceptable food products that may be offered by a home-based microprocessor for sale in this state.
Title
AN ACT relating to home-based food products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 612 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 172 (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 172 (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 77) |
2018-03-22 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-22 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-22 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-22 | House | received in House |
2018-03-21 | Senate | passed 38-0 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Committee Substitute withdrawn |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2018-03-21 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 21, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-02-23 | House | 3rd reading, passed 83-0 with Committee Substitute |
2018-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 23, 2018 |
2018-02-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-02-13 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-31 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2018-01-29 | House | introduced in House |