KY HB265 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 203)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 203)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 15.550 to require telecommunicators that provide dispatch for emergency medical conditions to be trained in high-quality telephone cardiopulmonary resuscitation (T-CPR).
Title
AN ACT relating to training for telecommunicators.
Sponsors
Rep. John Blanton [R] | Rep. Mark Hart [R] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] |
Rep. Sal Santoro [R] | Rep. John Sims [D] | Rep. William Wells [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 517 (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SCTA 1 RSN# 766 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 260 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SCTA 1 RSN# 766 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 260 (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | House | became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 203) |
2018-04-26 | House | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2018-04-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-04-14 | House | Bill passed 80-11 |
2018-04-14 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-04-14 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-04-14 | House | taken from Rules |
2018-04-14 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-04-14 | House | received in House |
2018-04-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-04-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Saturday, April 14, 2018 |
2018-04-14 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | taken from Rules (S) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-03-13 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-09 | House | 3rd reading, passed 84-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-08 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 9, 2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2018-03-01 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-08 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-02-08 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-07 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-02-02 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-31 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H) |
2018-01-29 | House | introduced in House |