KY HB270 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 6.500 to 6.577 to close the Legislators' Retirement Plan (LRP) to new members effective July 1, 2020, and to provide that new legislators shall participate in the Kentucky Employees Retirement System (KERS) for the duration of their legislative service; clarify that legislators who are also teachers contributing to the Teachers' Retirement System (TRS) may continue to participate in TRS while serving as a member of the General Assembly; provide that Legislators' Retirement Plan (LRP) members who entered the plan on or after 1/1/2014 and who are participating in the LRP cash balance plan shall have their account balance transferred to the KERS hybrid cash balance plan and shall prospectively participate in KERS for the duration of their legislative service; amend KRS 6.505 to provide that legislative changes that are enacted on or after July 1, 2020, for the Legislators' Retirement Plan shall not be part of the "inviolable contract" and to make conforming amendments; amend KRS 6.520 to provide that the LRP benefit factor for the traditional defined benefit plan shall be lowered from 2.75% to 1.97% for service accrued on or after July 1, 2020; amend KRS 6.525 to provide that non-legislative compensation earned in another state-administered retirement system on or after July 1, 2020, shall not be used to calculate benefits in the Legislators' Retirement Plan; amend KRS 21.525 to provide that the Judicial Form Retirement System shall not request nor receive any funding for the Legislators' Retirement Plan (LRP), except for administrative expenses, until such time the LRP plan has an actuarial funding level equal to or less than the KERS nonhazardous pension fund; amend KRS 61.510 to provide that for any service to the General Assembly that is credited to the Kentucky Employees Retirement System, no compensation earned for other covered public employment shall be used to determine the portion of their benefit related to their service to the General Assembly; amend KRS 6.500, 21.402, and 61.680 to conform and to restore/remove language due to a recent court ruling; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to retirement plans covering legislators and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. James Tipton [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-02-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-01-28 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-21 | House | to State Government (H) |
2020-01-16 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hb270.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hb270/orig_bill.pdf |