KY HB272 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to require the Kentucky Department of Education to develop and maintain lists of approved universal screeners and diagnostic assessments for reading and mathematics; require each local school board or public charter school board to adopt at least one approved universal screener and one approved diagnostic assessment; require teachers to be trained on any universal screener or diagnostic assessment adopted by a board; provide that beginning with the 2020-2021 school year an approved diagnostic assessment shall be administered to all students in kindergarten through grade three at designated times during the school year; require that an academic improvement plan be developed and implemented for any student with a deficiency in reading or mathematics; establish the definition, minimum requirements, and procedure for developing an academic improvement plan; require that the academic improvement plan be maintained until the deficiency is deemed remedied as defined by this Act; require a school to provide written notice to the parent or guardian of a student identified with a deficiency in reading or mathematics and establish the minimum requirements for such written notice; beginning with the 2020-2021 school year, require a local school district to provide a summer enrichment program and intensive instructional services for students identified with a deficiency in reading or mathematics; provide that beginning with the 2020-2021 school year, a student with a deficiency in reading or mathematics shall not be promoted to grade four without remedying the deficiency or completing intensive remediation in accordance with this Act; provide that beginning with the 2020-2021 school year, each school district shall collect and report specified reading and mathematics student performance data; require that the Department of Education establish reading and mathematics teacher academies or coaching models by September 1, 2020; require that the department collaborate with designated agencies to develop high quality, evidence-based reading and mathematics programming, materials, and activities; create a new section of KRS Chapter 164 to require that beginning with the 2020-2021 school year, teacher preparation programs for elementary regular education shall include specified reading and mathematics content; require that the Education Professional Standards Board to develop and maintain a list of approved reading and mathematics teacher preparation tests by January 1, 2020; require that beginning with the 2022-2023 school year, all new teachers seeking certification in Interdisciplinary Early Childhood Education or Elementary School Education pass approved reading and mathematics teacher preparation tests; amend KRS Chapter 158.792 to end the existing reading diagnostic and intervention grant program after the 2019-2020 school year; provide that beginning with the 2020-2021 school year the reading diagnostic and intervention fund shall fund a literacy coaching program developed by the Department of Education; amend KRS Chapter 158.794 to require the Reading Diagnostic and Intervention Grant Steering Committee to develop a multifaceted strategic plan to improve student achievement in reading for students in kindergarten through grade three and require the committee to advise the Kentucky Department of Education on specified issues; amend KRS Chapter 158.844 to end the existing mathematics achievement grant program after the 2019-2020 school year; provide that beginning with the 2020-2021 school year the mathematics achievement fund will fund the Center for Mathematics; the Kentucky Kid's First Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to early literacy and numeracy education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 175 (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04Senateto Education (S)
2019-03-01Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-28House3rd reading, passed 86-12 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-27Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 28, 2019
2019-02-27House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-26Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-22Houseposted in committee
2019-02-08Houseto Education (H)
2019-02-07Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback