KY HB274 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 117.085 to require that all requests for an application for a mail-in absentee ballot be received by the county clerk by the close of business hours fourteen days before the election; permit a county clerk to transmit an application for a mail-in absentee ballot to the voter by electronic mail; require cancellation of a mail-in absentee ballot no later than fourteen days before the election; amend KRS 117.075 to make technical corrections and to conform; amend KRS 117A.060 and 117A.070 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Kenny Imes [R] | Rep. James Tipton [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 753 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 136 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 136 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | vetoed |
2018-04-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-04-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-04-14 | House | received in House |
2018-04-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2018-04-02 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2018-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, April 2, 2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill |
2018-03-20 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | 1st reading |
2018-03-19 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-02-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2018-02-13 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 14, 2018 |
2018-02-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-02-08 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-01 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB274.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/HB274/bill.pdf |
Roll Call | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/HB274/vote_history.pdf |