KY HB275 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 531.335 to raise the penalty for possession or viewing of matter portraying a sexual performance by a minor under the age of 12 years to a Class C felony; amend KRS 531.340 to raise the penalty for the distribution of matter portraying a sexual performance of a minor under the age of 12 years to a Class C felony for the first offense and a Class B felony for each subsequent offense.
Title
AN ACT relating to the sexual exploitation of minors.
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Lewis [R] | Rep. Jason Petrie [R] | Rep. Kim King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | posting withdrawn |
2020-01-24 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-21 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-01-16 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Children and Minors
Corrections Impact
Crime Victims
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Local Mandate
Corrections Impact
Crime Victims
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Local Mandate