KY HB276 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-08 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 141.418 to expand the voluntary environmental remediation tax credit for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2019, but before January 1, 2023, and to allow a refundable credit for these taxable years; amend KRS 141.0205 to order the refundable credit; amend KRS 131.190 to require reporting on the refundable credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the voluntary environmental remediation tax credit.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-08Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-02-07Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback