KY HB278 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.298 to clarify the definition of "governing board" and to include a college governing board as an entity required to collaborate with the Kentucky Board of Nursing in offering an advanced practice doctoral degree in nursing.
Title
AN ACT relating to nurse education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | signed by Governor | |
2011-03-04 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-03-04 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2011-03-04 | received in House | |
2011-03-04 | passed 37-0 | |
2011-03-04 | floor amendments (1-title) and (2) withdrawn | |
2011-03-04 | 3rd reading | |
2011-03-03 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 4, 2011 | |
2011-03-02 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-03-01 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-24 | floor amendments (1-title) and (2) filed | |
2011-02-15 | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) | |
2011-02-11 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-11 | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 | |
2011-02-09 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 11, 2011 | |
2011-02-09 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-08 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-04 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-02 | to Education (H) | |
2011-02-01 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB278.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB278/bill.doc |