KY HB285 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 120)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 120)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 286.4-410, relating to consumer loan companies, to define certain terms; amend KRS 286.4-430 to require applicant to submit specific information with an application for licensure; amend KRS 286.4-440 to increase licensing application fee, and fee per location; amend KRS 286.4-450 to establish financial requirements for applicants and licensees; amend the application approval process; establish process for an appeal of an application denial; restrict eligibility for a license for individuals who have had a license previously denied or revoked; amend KRS 286.4-460 to require disclosure of physical address, and any assumed names; require notice to the commissioner of a change in name; amend KRS 286.4-470 to add tax preparation to business that may be conducted in same location as consumer loan business and add 60 day review requirement; amend KRS 286.4-480 to establish the expiration of a license for failure to pay annual fee; repeal and reenact KRS 286.4-490 to define adverse action; establish when the commissioner may take adverse action; establish procedure following the adverse action; allow the commissioner to seek temporary or permanent relief against a person who has violated Subtitle 4 of KRS Chapter 286; amend KRS 286.4-500 to establish requirements and procedures for orders entered by the commissioner; allow the commissioner to file administrative complaints; amend KRS 286.4-533 to replace collection of credit investigation fee with loan processing fee; amend KRS 286.4-580 to make technical changes; amend KRS 286.4-600 to make changes to retention requirements; allow for a licensee to designate a custodian of records; require access to records for the commissioner; amend KRS 286.4-610 to set examination frequency of licensees and to establish examination and investigation powers of the commissioner; create a new section of Subtitle 4 of KRS Chapter 286 to allow for use of the State Regulatory Registry by the department and licensees; create a new section of Subtitle 4 of KRS Chapter 286 to require licensees maintain an agent in Kentucky; create a new section of Subtitle 4 of KRS Chapter 286 to establish requirements for change of control of a licensee; create a new section of Subtitle 4 of KRS Chapter 286 to require compliance with applicable state and federal law; create a new section of Subtitle 4 of KRS Chapter 286 to exempt certain items from required disclosure under the Kentucky Open Records Act; create a new section of Subtitle 4 of KRS Chapter 286 to establish emergency powers of the commissioner under this subtitle; create a new section of Subtitle 4 of KRS Chapter 286 to allow for a hearing for any person aggrieved by a final decision of the commissioner; establish penalties for violations of this subtitle; repeal KRS 286.4-630.
Title
AN ACT relating to consumer loan companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 333 (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 960 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 113 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 960 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 113 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 120) |
2019-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | passed 96-2 |
2019-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-13 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-13 | House | to Rules (H) |
2019-03-13 | House | received in House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2019-03-07 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2019-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-05 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-21 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-15 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-11 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2019-02-08 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Banks and Financial Institutions
Bonds of Surety
Consumer Affairs
Courts, Circuit
Fees
Financial Responsibility
Licensing
Loans and Credit
State Agencies
Bonds of Surety
Consumer Affairs
Courts, Circuit
Fees
Financial Responsibility
Licensing
Loans and Credit
State Agencies