KY HB29 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-10 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 139.010 to exclude fees paid to enter or participate in a fishing tournament and fees paid for the usage of a boat ramp from the definition of admissions; apply to fees paid on or after July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the taxation of admissions for sales and use tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-10Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-01-08Houseintroduced in House
2018-09-06HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback