KY HB291 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 118)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 330.020 to amend the definition of "auction house" and define "escrow account"; amend KRS 330.060 to allow the board to waive the attainment of a high school diploma if an applicant demonstrates sufficient life experience and competency; amend KRS 330.110 to require requested information to be turned over within 30 days and to require compliance with the chapter and administrative regulations; amend KRS 330.220 to allow auctioneers at reserve auctions and without-reserve auctions to establish reasonable, minimum bid increments once an opening bid has been offered; amend KRS 330.990 to establish jurisdiction for injunctive relief in the county where an alleged offender resides.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to auctioneers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 324 (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 951 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 114 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 118)
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-13Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-13Housepassed 94-3
2019-03-13HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-13Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-13Housetaken from Rules
2019-03-12Houseto Rules (H)
2019-03-12Housereceived in House
2019-03-12Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-03-12Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019
2019-03-07Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) as a consent bill
2019-03-06Senatereturned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-03-06Senate1st reading
2019-03-06Senatetaken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-02-27Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2019-02-25Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-22House3rd reading, passed 95-0
2019-02-21Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2019
2019-02-21House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-20Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-15Houseposted in committee
2019-02-11Houseto Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
2019-02-08Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback